AL SB410 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development second Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Military bases, counties and municipalities, formation of redevelopment authorities to finance projects contiguous to operating or closed bases, eminent domain powers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military bases, counties and municipalities, formation of redevelopment authorities to finance projects contiguous to operating or closed bases, eminent domain powers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Butler motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Butler motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Butler motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateFiscal Responsibility and Economic Development second Amendment Offered
2019-05-30HouseFiscal Responsibility first Amendment Offered
2019-05-30HouseFurther Consideration
2019-05-30HouseSells motion to Carry Over to Call of Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-30HouseFiscal Responsibility Amendment Offered
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2019-05-28HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-05-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Fiscal Responsibility
2019-05-23SenateEngrossed
2019-05-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1144
2019-05-23SenateButler motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1143
2019-05-23SenateButler Amendment Offered
2019-05-23SenateButler motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1142
2019-05-23SenateFiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered
2019-05-23SenateButler motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1141
2019-05-23SenateFiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-23SenateSingleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-23SenateFiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-05-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2019-05-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB410&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB410-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201661-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201565-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201936-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202014-3.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=623038&VOTE=1141&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=623040&VOTE=1142&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=623052&VOTE=1143&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=623053&VOTE=1144&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback