AL SB409 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:27 a.m. on May 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:27 a.m. on May 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Geneva Co., judge of probate, election or appointment, person not over the age of 75 authorized, const. amend.
Title
Geneva Co., judge of probate, election or appointment, person not over the age of 75 authorized, const. amend.
Sponsors
Sen. Harri Smith [I] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - House - Chesteen motion to adopt resolution of local application (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:27 a.m. on May 18, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-05-17 | House | Chesteen motion to adopt resolution of local application adopted Roll Call 968 |
2017-05-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 967 |
2017-05-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 939 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |