AL SB393 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2017-341.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Springville, corp. limits, alt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Springville, corp. limits, alt.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17SenateAssigned Act No. 2017-341.
2017-05-17SenateEnrolled
2017-05-17HouseSignature Requested
2017-05-17SenatePassed Second House
2017-05-17HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 942
2017-05-17HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-05-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2017-05-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 899
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback