AL SB392 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Beasley motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Beasley motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Baker Hill, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales under certain conditions
Title
Baker Hill, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales under certain conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Beasley motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Beasley motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1236 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Executive Amendment Offered |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 12:00 p.m. on March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 984 |
2018-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 903 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |