AL SB391 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Jefferson County Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Jefferson County Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Class 1 municipalities, (Birmingham), fiscal year city council authorized October 1, to move start date to deadlines for submission of budget proposal and adoption of general fund budget, budget hearing, publication of notice of meeting, Act 452, 1955 Reg. Sess.; Act 792, 1973 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Class 1 municipalities, (Birmingham), fiscal year city council authorized October 1, to move start date to deadlines for submission of budget proposal and adoption of general fund budget, budget hearing, publication of notice of meeting, Act 452, 1955 Reg. Sess.; Act 792, 1973 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Coleman-Madison [D] | Sen. Priscilla Dunn [D] | Sen. J.T. Waggoner [R] | Sen. Slade Blackwell [R] |
Sen. Rodger Smitherman [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Jefferson County Legislation |
2013-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 767 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 2 |