AL SB389 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 3:22 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 3:22 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthen Alabama Homes Program, established within Insurance Department, funding for retrofitting insurable property to resist future loss due to hurricanes or windstorms
Title
Strengthen Alabama Homes Program, established within Insurance Department, funding for retrofitting insurable property to resist future loss due to hurricanes or windstorms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - House - Buskey motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Brooks motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Brooks motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Brooks motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Brooks motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 3:22 p.m. on June 2, 2011 | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-643. | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment | |
2011-06-02 | Buskey motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1088 | |
2011-06-02 | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment | |
2011-05-26 | Brooks motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 775 | |
2011-05-26 | Executive Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-26 | Forwarded to Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-05 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-05 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2011-05-05 | Brooks motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 528 | |
2011-05-05 | Concurrence Requested | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 687 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 686 | |
2011-05-05 | Insurance Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-04-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance | |
2011-04-28 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 421 | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 420 | |
2011-04-27 | Coleman Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Request to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair granted. | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 417 | |
2011-04-27 | Brooks Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2011-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |