AL SB387 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Chambliss motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Chambliss motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coosa Co., judge of probate, fees for remote access of records, authorized, disposition of funds
Title
Coosa Co., judge of probate, fees for remote access of records, authorized, disposition of funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 73 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Executive Amendment Offered |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor |
2018-03-22 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 995 |
2018-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 909 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |