AL SB386 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 11:26 a.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 11:26 a.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal sentences, modification of sentencing standard effective after submission unless rejected, truth-in-sentencing standards to be submitted to Legislature, sentencing standards made presumptive subject to modification for certain mitigating and aggravating circumstances, Secs. 12-25-3, 12-25-32, 12-25-34, 12-25-36 am'd. (2012-20412)
Title
Criminal sentences, modification of sentencing standard effective after submission unless rejected, truth-in-sentencing standards to be submitted to Legislature, sentencing standards made presumptive subject to modification for certain mitigating and aggravating circumstances, Secs. 12-25-3, 12-25-32, 12-25-34, 12-25-36 am'd. (2012-20412)
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Delivered to Governor at 11:26 a.m. on May 10, 2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-473. | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-05-09 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1274 | |
2012-05-09 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1420 | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1419 | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1418 | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1417 | |
2012-05-09 | JUDY 3rd Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-09 | JUDY 2nd Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-09 | JUDY 1st Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments | |
2012-04-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-03 | Engrossed | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 396 | |
2012-03-22 | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 395 | |
2012-03-22 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |