AL SB384 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-387.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Birmingham, alcoholic beverage, Sunday sales, city council authorized to commence at 10:00 a.m.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Birmingham, alcoholic beverage, Sunday sales, city council authorized to commence at 10:00 a.m.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-387.
2018-03-22SenateDelivered to Governor at 12:00 p.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22SenateEnrolled
2018-03-22HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-22SenatePassed Second House
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 972
2018-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-21HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
2018-03-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 897
2018-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback