AL SB383 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools, security personnel and resource officers employed by local board of education authorized to carry a firearm under certain conditions, Sec. 13A-11-72 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools, security personnel and resource officers employed by local board of education authorized to carry a firearm under certain conditions, Sec. 13A-11-72 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-20 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Table (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Table (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
2013-05-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-288.
2013-05-20HouseSignature Requested
2013-05-20SenateEnrolled
2013-05-20HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2013-05-20SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1049
2013-05-20SenateConcurrence Requested
2013-05-09HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1212
2013-05-09HouseHammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1211
2013-05-09HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1210
2013-05-09HouseMcClurkin Amendment Offered
2013-05-09HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1209
2013-05-09HouseEducation Policy Amendment Offered
2013-05-09HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-05-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2013-04-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2013-04-30SenateEngrossed
2013-04-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 641
2013-04-30SenateBrewbaker motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 640
2013-04-30SenateBrewbaker motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 639
2013-04-30SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 638
2013-04-30SenateBrewbaker Amendment Offered
2013-04-30SenateBrewbaker first Substitute Offered
2013-04-30SenateBrewbaker motion to Table adopted Roll Call 637
2013-04-30SenateEducation Amendment Offered
2013-04-30SenateBrewbaker motion to Table adopted Roll Call 636
2013-04-30SenateEducation Amendment Offered
2013-04-30SenateBrewbaker motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2013-04-30SenateEducation Amendment Offered
2013-04-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-04-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments
2013-04-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB383
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/SB383-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/SB383-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/SB383-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=470961&VOTE=636&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=470962&VOTE=637&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=470977&VOTE=638&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=471005&VOTE=639&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=471009&VOTE=640&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=471014&VOTE=641&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475156&VOTE=1209&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475165&VOTE=1210&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475166&VOTE=1211&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475173&VOTE=1212&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475779&VOTE=1049&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback