AL SB371 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Delivered to Governor at 9:28 p.m. on March 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Delivered to Governor at 9:28 p.m. on March 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jackson Co., co. commission, chair, compensation, Sec. 45-36-70 am'd.
Title
Jackson Co., co. commission, chair, compensation, Sec. 45-36-70 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - Hanes motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Livingston motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 79 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Livingston motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 79 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 9:28 p.m. on March 28, 2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-516. |
2018-03-28 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2018-03-28 | House | Hanes motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1097 |
2018-03-28 | House | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Livingston motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1237 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Executive Amendment Offered |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 982 |
2018-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 911 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |