AL SB361 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-545.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-545.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pardons and Paroles Board, law enforcement officers, authorized to expend funds for recruitment and training, Sec. 15-22-24 am'd.
Title
Pardons and Paroles Board, law enforcement officers, authorized to expend funds for recruitment and training, Sec. 15-22-24 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Albritton motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1416 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1184 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1183 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 1182 (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 891 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 890 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 889 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1184 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1183 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 1182 (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 891 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 890 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 889 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-545. |
2021-05-17 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-05-17 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Albritton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1416 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2021-05-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1184 |
2021-05-17 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1183 |
2021-05-17 | House | Jones (M) Amendment Offered |
2021-05-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 891 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 890 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |