AL SB36 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oil and Gas Board, underground gas storage facilities, regulation, gas further defined to include abandonment of underground storage facilities, performance bonds, fees by board, Secs. 9-17-150, 9-17-151 am'd.
Title
Oil and Gas Board, underground gas storage facilities, regulation, gas further defined to include abandonment of underground storage facilities, performance bonds, fees by board, Secs. 9-17-150, 9-17-151 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 150 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - HBIR: Drummond motion to Adopt Roll Call 149 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 29 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 28 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 27 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - HBIR: Drummond motion to Adopt Roll Call 149 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 29 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 28 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 27 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Forwarded to Executive Department |
2022-02-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-40. |
2022-02-16 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-02-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 150 |
2022-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 29 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 28 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB97 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - Drummond motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 17 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 17 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |