AL SB358 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Apprenticeships, completion of apprenticeship and fulfillment of other requirements to entitle applicant to receive occupational license, Secs. 25-8-33, 25-8-35, and 25-8-43 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Apprenticeships, completion of apprenticeship and fulfillment of other requirements to entitle applicant to receive occupational license, Secs. 25-8-33, 25-8-35, and 25-8-43 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28HousePending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Education Policy
2019-05-28HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2019-05-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 914
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-30SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback