AL SB354 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sexual offenses, redefined certain sexual offenses, sex offender registration, community notification act, add foster parent engaging in sex act, technical revisions, Secs. 13A-6-60 to 13A-6-67, inclusive, 13A-6-70, 13A-6-71, 13A-6-81 to 13A-6-83, inclusive, 13A-6-122, 13A-6-241, 13A-6-243, 13A-11-9, 13A-12-120, 13A-12-121, 15-20A-5, 15-20A-6, 15-20A-44, 15-23-101, 15-23-102 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual offenses, redefined certain sexual offenses, sex offender registration, community notification act, add foster parent engaging in sex act, technical revisions, Secs. 13A-6-60 to 13A-6-67, inclusive, 13A-6-70, 13A-6-71, 13A-6-81 to 13A-6-83, inclusive, 13A-6-122, 13A-6-241, 13A-6-243, 13A-11-9, 13A-12-120, 13A-12-121, 15-20A-5, 15-20A-6, 15-20A-44, 15-23-101, 15-23-102 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseJudiciary first Amendment Offered
2018-03-21HousePending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
2018-03-21HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-03-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2018-03-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 886
2018-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-01SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback