AL SB347 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Assigned Act No. 2021-281.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Randolph Co., sheriff, qualifications, continuing education required

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Randolph Co., sheriff, qualifications, continuing education required

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 828 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - House - HBIR: Fincher motion to Adopt Roll Call 827 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 855 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 854 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateAssigned Act No. 2021-281.
2021-04-15HouseSignature Requested
2021-04-15SenateEnrolled
2021-04-15SenatePassed Second House
2021-04-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 828
2021-04-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-04-13HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-04-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2021-04-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 855
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-04-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-03-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB347&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB347-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB347-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=656682&VOTE=854&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB347&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=656684&VOTE=855&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=658502&VOTE=827&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB347&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=658504&VOTE=828&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback