AL SB347 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Transportation and Energy first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Transportation and Energy first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Toll Roads and Bridges, notice to pay a toll, further provided, failure to pay toll citation, further provided, non-renewal of vehicle registration, provided, authority to enter in reciprocal agreements, further provided, Revenue Dept. required to provide registration info., Secs. 23-2-167, 23-2-168, 23-2-169, 23-2-172, 23-2-173, 23-2-175 am'd.
Title
Toll Roads and Bridges, notice to pay a toll, further provided, failure to pay toll citation, further provided, non-renewal of vehicle registration, provided, authority to enter in reciprocal agreements, further provided, Revenue Dept. required to provide registration info., Secs. 23-2-167, 23-2-168, 23-2-169, 23-2-172, 23-2-173, 23-2-175 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 23 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Transportation and Energy first Amendment Offered |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-501. |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1129 |
2019-05-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1066 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1065 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |