AL SB334 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, beer manufacturers sell on Sundays in limited circumstances, Sec. 28-3A-25 am'd.
Title
Alcoholic beverages, beer manufacturers sell on Sundays in limited circumstances, Sec. 28-3A-25 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |