AL SB332 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Kitchens motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Cherokee Ridge, corp. limits alt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cherokee Ridge, corp. limits alt.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 846 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 845 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-07HouseKitchens motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
2022-04-07HouseThird Reading Indefinitely Postponed
2022-04-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-03-31HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2022-03-31SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 846
2022-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed
2022-03-30SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-03-29SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Same As/Similar To

HB524 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022.

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback