AL SB329 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-26 - Referred to Committee to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to judges and justices; to prohibit government agencies, individuals, businesses, and associations from publicly posting or displaying judge's or justice's personal information on the Internet, provided they have received a written request from the judge or justice to refrain from doing so; to prohibit commercial data collectors from knowingly selling, trading, licensing, transferring, or purchasing judges' personal information; to provide for a process for a judge or justice to request their personal information not be made public; to provide for penalties for violations; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to judges and justices; to prohibit government agencies, individuals, businesses, and associations from publicly posting or displaying judge's or justice's personal information on the Internet, provided they have received a written request from the judge or justice to refrain from doing so; to prohibit commercial data collectors from knowingly selling, trading, licensing, transferring, or purchasing judges' personal information; to provide for a process for a judge or justice to request their personal information not be made public; to provide for penalties for violations; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-25 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Adopt 4GJ7I3-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-26HouseReferred to Committee to House Judiciary
2023-05-26SenateRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-25SenateRead A Third Time And Passed As Amended
2023-05-25SenateAdopt 4GJ7I3-1
2023-05-25SenateOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-05-24SenateRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-05-24SenateAmendment/Substitute by Senate Judiciary 4GJ7I3-1
2023-05-24SenateReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-05-24SenateReported Favorably from Senate Judiciary
2023-05-16SenateIntroduced and Referred to Senate Judiciary
2023-05-16SenateRead First Time in House of Origin

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/SB329-int.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/SB329-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/79SXVE-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/4GJ7I3-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-N57Q8J-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-N57Q8J-2.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-N57Q8J-3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1104
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1105

Bill Comments

feedback