AL SB319 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-377.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-377.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture and Industries, Commissioner, salary set beginning the next term of office, Sec. 2-2-5 am'd.
Title
Agriculture and Industries, Commissioner, salary set beginning the next term of office, Sec. 2-2-5 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1092 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1002 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1001 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 899 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Sessions motion to Adopt Roll Call 898 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1002 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1001 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 899 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Sessions motion to Adopt Roll Call 898 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-377. |
2022-04-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1092 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-07 | House | Oliver intended to vote "Yea" |
2022-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1002 |
2022-04-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1001 |
2022-04-07 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-03-31 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 899 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry |
Same As/Similar To
HB471 (Same As) 2022-03-30 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund