AL SB311 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from State Government with 1 substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Lottery and gaming, certain campaign contributions by operator of gaming facilities prohibited under certain conditions, certain criminal penalties updated, to prescribe certain activity relating to gaming as unlawful and provide for criminal penalties, Secs. 13A-12-32 to 13A-12-39, inclusive, added; Secs. 11-47-111, 13A-12-29, 13A-12-50 to 13A-12-58, inclusive, 13A-12-70 to 13A-12-76, inclusive, 13A-12-90 to 13A-12-92, inclusive, repealed; Secs. 13A-11-9, 13A-12-20, 13A-12-21, 13A-12-22, 13A-12-23, 13A-12-24, 13A-12-25, 13A-12-26, 13A-12-27, 13A-12-28, 13A-12-30 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lottery and gaming, certain campaign contributions by operator of gaming facilities prohibited under certain conditions, certain criminal penalties updated, to prescribe certain activity relating to gaming as unlawful and provide for criminal penalties, Secs. 13A-12-32 to 13A-12-39, inclusive, added; Secs. 11-47-111, 13A-12-29, 13A-12-50 to 13A-12-58, inclusive, 13A-12-70 to 13A-12-76, inclusive, 13A-12-90 to 13A-12-92, inclusive, repealed; Secs. 13A-11-9, 13A-12-20, 13A-12-21, 13A-12-22, 13A-12-23, 13A-12-24, 13A-12-25, 13A-12-26, 13A-12-27, 13A-12-28, 13A-12-30 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 956 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 955 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 954 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HousePending third reading on day 29 Favorable from State Government with 1 substitute
2021-05-04HouseState Government first Substitute Offered
2021-05-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2021-04-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2021-04-15SenateEngrossed
2021-04-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 956
2021-04-13SenateBarfoot motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 955
2021-04-13SenateBarfoot Amendment Offered
2021-04-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-03-18SenateReported from Tourism as Favorable
2021-03-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1147111Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A119Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A1220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A1221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A1222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A1223Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A1224Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A1225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A1226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A1227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A1228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A1229Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1230Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A1232New CodeSee Bill Text
13A1233New CodeSee Bill Text
13A1234New CodeSee Bill Text
13A1235New CodeSee Bill Text
13A1236New CodeSee Bill Text
13A1237New CodeSee Bill Text
13A1238New CodeSee Bill Text
13A1239New CodeSee Bill Text
13A1250Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1251Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1252Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1253Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1254Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1255Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1256Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1257Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1258Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1270Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1271Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1272Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1273Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1274Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1275Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1276Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1290Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1291Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13A1292Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB311&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB311-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB311-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213125-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213950-2.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42417.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42926.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42971.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657851&VOTE=954&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB311&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657856&VOTE=955&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657857&VOTE=956&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback