AL SB311 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Weaver, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, off-premises sales, referendum
Title
Weaver, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, off-premises sales, referendum
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 30 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-313. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1279 |
2013-05-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 728 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |