AL SB31 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2021-164.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Elections, runoff elections, to be held four weeks after municipal and special primary elections, Secs. 11-46-6, 11-46-21, 11-46-55, 17-13-3 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections, runoff elections, to be held four weeks after municipal and special primary elections, Secs. 11-46-6, 11-46-21, 11-46-55, 17-13-3 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 583 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Meadows motion to Adopt Roll Call 582 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 105 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Roberts motion to Adopt Roll Call 104 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateAssigned Act No. 2021-164.
2021-04-01SenateEnrolled
2021-04-01HouseSignature Requested
2021-04-01SenatePassed Second House
2021-04-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 583
2021-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-03-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
2021-02-09SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 105
2021-02-09SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-02-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB113 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
114621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
114655Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11466Amended CodeSee Bill Text
17133Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB31&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB31-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB31-enr.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41471.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42096.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=644108&VOTE=104&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB31&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=644110&VOTE=105&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=654415&VOTE=582&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB31&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=654419&VOTE=583&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback