AL SB308 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned Act No. 2021-246.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned Act No. 2021-246.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms, concealed carry permits, time periods for permits including lifetime permits, fees, statewide standardized issuance and information management, ALEA to estab., firearms prohibited person database, appeal process provided, Sec. 13A-11-75.1 repealed; Secs. 13A-11-70, 13A-11-75, 22-52-10.1 am'd.
Title
Firearms, concealed carry permits, time periods for permits including lifetime permits, fees, statewide standardized issuance and information management, ALEA to estab., firearms prohibited person database, appeal process provided, Sec. 13A-11-75.1 repealed; Secs. 13A-11-70, 13A-11-75, 22-52-10.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 704 (Y: 69 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - HBIR: Robertson motion to Adopt Roll Call 703 (Y: 69 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 725 (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 724 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate Roll Call 723 (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 722 (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - HBIR: Robertson motion to Adopt Roll Call 703 (Y: 69 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 725 (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 724 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate Roll Call 723 (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 722 (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-246. |
2021-04-13 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 704 |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-04-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 725 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Price motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 724 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 723 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Price first Substitute Offered |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB477 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13A | 11 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 11 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 11 | 75.1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 52 | 10.1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |