AL SB305 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
Pending: House Economic Development and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Community development districts, add'l type authorized, marina on lake, sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises and off-premises consumption, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community development districts, add'l type authorized, marina on lake, sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises and off-premises consumption, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 73 Abs: 10) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
2018-03-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 746
2018-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback