AL SB303 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Pending: House Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Pending: House Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sheriffs, term of office, to commence following election, technical revisions to term of county commissioner, Sec. 36-3-4 am'd.
Title
Sheriffs, term of office, to commence following election, technical revisions to term of county commissioner, Sec. 36-3-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1026 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 1025 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 1024 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 1025 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 1024 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1026 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1025 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB215 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed