AL SB303 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Governor on May 10, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Governor on May 10, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tuskegee University, appropriation
Title
Tuskegee University, appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Forwarded to Governor on May 10, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-469. | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1478 | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education | |
2012-05-03 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 935 | |
2012-05-02 | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 934 | |
2012-05-02 | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |