AL SB3 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Pending third reading on day 6 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Pending third reading on day 6 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, golf carts and low-speed vehicles, prohibited from use on public highways
Title
Motor vehicles, golf carts and low-speed vehicles, prohibited from use on public highways
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Pending third reading on day 6 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure as Favorable |
2019-03-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended adopted Roll Call 21 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 20 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Holley Amendment Offered |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider pending |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 14 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 13 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Albritton Amendment Offered |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 12 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Scofield Amendment Offered |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 11 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Holley first Substitute Offered |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Holley motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |