AL SB3 | 2010 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-16 - Delivered to Governor at 2:20 a.m. on 12/16/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Legislators, employment with other branch of state government or other state agencies, etc., including public education, during the time in office, prohibited, exceptions, liability for any violations, Attorney General to enforce, Legislative Double Dipping Prohibition Act (2010-21257)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislators, employment with other branch of state government or other state agencies, etc., including public education, during the time in office, prohibited, exceptions, liability for any violations, Attorney General to enforce, Legislative Double Dipping Prohibition Act (2010-21257)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-19 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Bridges motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Barton motion to Accede (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 68 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 74 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt Newton (D) amendment (Y: 55 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Bridges motion to Table (Y: 31 N: 51 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2012-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-12-16 Delivered to Governor at 2:20 a.m. on 12/16/2010
2010-12-16 Assigned Act No. 2010-760.
2010-12-16 Signature Requested
2010-12-16 Enrolled
2010-12-16 Concurred in Conference Report
2010-12-16 Warren and Chesteen abstained due to possible conflict
2010-12-16 Bridges motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 76
2010-12-16 Conference Report Concurrence Requested
2010-12-16 Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 74
2010-12-16 Conference Committee on SB3 2010FS first Substitute Offered
2010-12-16 Conference Report
2010-12-15 Barton motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 75 House appoints Bridges, Merrill and Hall
2010-12-15 Conference Committee Requested
2010-12-15 Conference Committee Appointed
2010-12-15 Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 70 Senate appoints Waggoner, Ross and Orr.
2010-12-15 Concurrence Requested
2010-12-15 Bandy, Boyd, Bracy, Buskey, Coleman, England, Hall, Holmes, Givan, Howard, Knight, McAdory, McCampbell, McClammy, Melton, Moore (M), Newton (D) Robinson (O), Rogers, Scott filed dissents
2010-12-15 Colston, Moore (B), Grimsley, Chesteen and Warren abstained due to a possible conflict of interest and Knight intended to vote "Nay"
2010-12-15 Moore (B) intended to vote "Abstain"
2010-12-15 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 73
2010-12-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 72
2010-12-15 Mask Amendment Offered
2010-12-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 71
2010-12-15 Hill Amendment Offered
2010-12-15 Motion to Adopt Newton (D) amendment adopted Roll Call 69
2010-12-15 Bridges motion to Table lost Roll Call 68
2010-12-15 Newton (D) Amendment Offered
2010-12-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 67
2010-12-15 Black Amendment Offered
2010-12-15 Died in Committee on 12/16/2010
2010-12-13 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-12-10 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics
2010-12-10 Engrossed
2010-12-10 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 25
2010-12-10 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 24
2010-12-10 Waggoner Amendment Offered
2010-12-10 Waggoner motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2010-12-10 Waggoner Amendment Offered
2010-12-10 Waggoner motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2010-12-10 Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
2010-12-10 Third Reading Passed
2010-12-09 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2010-12-08 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB3
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/SB3-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=393732&VOTE=24&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=393733&VOTE=25&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394576&VOTE=67&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394579&VOTE=68&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394583&VOTE=69&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394596&VOTE=71&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394599&VOTE=72&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394600&VOTE=73&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394611&VOTE=70&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394629&VOTE=75&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394729&VOTE=74&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394742&VOTE=76&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback