AL SB296 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sentencing, to further provide for procedures relating to voluntary sentencing standards worksheets, Sec. 12-25-35 am'd.
Title
Sentencing, to further provide for procedures relating to voluntary sentencing standards worksheets, Sec. 12-25-35 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1167 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - SBIR: Roberts motion to Adopt Roll Call 1166 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - SBIR: Roberts motion to Adopt Roll Call 1166 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from State Government |
2021-05-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1167 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Acted on by Judiciary as Favorable |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB425 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary