AL SB292 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Assigned Act No. 2010-221.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Assigned Act No. 2010-221.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers' Retirement System and Employees' Retirement System, pension accumulation fund, accrued liability contribution rate authorized to be computed by Board of Control over 30-year period, Sec. 16-25-21, 36-27-24 am'd.
Title
Teachers' Retirement System and Employees' Retirement System, pension accumulation fund, accrued liability contribution rate authorized to be computed by Board of Control over 30-year period, Sec. 16-25-21, 36-27-24 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Assigned Act No. 2010-221. | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-11 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-11 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 552 | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Appropriations | |
2010-02-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 243 | |
2010-02-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |