AL SB291 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to public contracts; to amend Section 41-16-51, Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for contracts for which competitive bidding is not required; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public contracts; to amend Section 41-16-51, Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for contracts for which competitive bidding is not required; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-06 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - Table IY7HZW-1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Adopt 2N0GSI-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06SenateEnacted
2023-06-06SenateEnrolled
2023-06-06HouseReady to Enroll
2023-06-06HouseRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-06-06HouseTable IY7HZW-1
2023-06-06HouseOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-31HouseRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-31HouseReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-31HouseReported Favorably from House State Government
2023-05-25HouseAmendment/Substitute by House State Government IY7HZW-1
2023-05-25HouseReferred to Committee to House State Government
2023-05-25SenateRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-24SenateRead A Third Time And Passed As Amended
2023-05-24SenateAdopt 2N0GSI-1
2023-05-24SenateOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-05-11SenateRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-05-10SenateReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-05-10SenateReported Favorably from Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
2023-05-03SenateIntroduced and Referred to Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
2023-05-03SenateRead First Time in House of Origin

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/SB291-int.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/SB291-eng.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/SB291-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/2N0GSI-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/IY7HZW-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-ZS44RR-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-ZS44RR-2.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-ZS44RR-3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc989
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc990
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1150
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1151

Bill Comments

feedback