AL SB290 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned Act No. 2018-432.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clay Co., tobacco tax, distrib. further provided for, Act 2017-65, 2017 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 45-14-244.07 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clay Co., tobacco tax, distrib. further provided for, Act 2017-65, 2017 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 45-14-244.07 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-432.
2018-03-21HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-21SenateEnrolled
2018-03-20HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-20SenateDial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 915
2018-03-20SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 798
2018-03-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 797
2018-03-15HouseHurst Amendment Offered
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2018-02-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 406
2018-02-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback