AL SB280 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

County Superintendent of Education, required to be appointed unless provided otherwise by constitution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Superintendent of Education, required to be appointed unless provided otherwise by constitution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HousePending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Education Policy
2018-03-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2018-03-08SenateEngrossed
2018-03-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 725
2018-03-08SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 724
2018-03-08SenateMarsh Amendment Offered
2018-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback