AL SB279 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to elected county superintendents of education; to remove the requirement that the salary of the superintendent be set before the beginning of the term of office; and to provide for a retroactive effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to elected county superintendents of education; to remove the requirement that the salary of the superintendent be set before the beginning of the term of office; and to provide for a retroactive effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-31 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-31SenateEnacted
2023-05-31SenateEnrolled
2023-05-31HouseReady to Enroll
2023-05-31HouseRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-31HouseOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-24HouseRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-24HouseReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-24HouseReported Favorably from House Education Policy
2023-05-11HouseReferred to Committee to House Education Policy
2023-05-11SenateRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-11SenateRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-11SenateOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-05-03SenateRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-05-03SenateReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-05-03SenateReported Favorably from Senate State Governmental Affairs
2023-05-02SenateIntroduced and Referred to Senate State Governmental Affairs
2023-05-02SenateRead First Time in House of Origin

Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback