AL SB279 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-469.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-469.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, courts, supreme court and courts of appeal, judicial seats further provided for
Title
Elections, courts, supreme court and courts of appeal, judicial seats further provided for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-469. |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1358 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1148 |
2019-05-29 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1147 |
2019-05-29 | House | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered |
2019-05-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 645 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |