AL SB279 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Act No. 2018-191.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Act No. 2018-191.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Union Springs, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales authorized, referendum required
Title
Union Springs, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales authorized, referendum required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-191. |
2018-03-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 540 |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 467 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |