AL SB279 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled substances, additional penalties for convictions of, addition drug-related crimes included, driver's license suspension required for additional convictions for drug-related convictions, Secs. 13A-12-281, 13A-12-291 am'd.
Title
Controlled substances, additional penalties for convictions of, addition drug-related crimes included, driver's license suspension required for additional convictions for drug-related convictions, Secs. 13A-12-281, 13A-12-291 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |