AL SB272 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency medical services, regulation by Health Department further provided for, advanced emergency medical technicians, State Emergency Medical Control Committee, members, Secs. 22-18-1, 22-18-2, 22-18-3, 22-18-4, 22-18-6, 22-18-8, 22-18-40, 22-18-41, 22-18-42 am'd.
Title
Emergency medical services, regulation by Health Department further provided for, advanced emergency medical technicians, State Emergency Medical Control Committee, members, Secs. 22-18-1, 22-18-2, 22-18-3, 22-18-4, 22-18-6, 22-18-8, 22-18-40, 22-18-41, 22-18-42 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2010-04-08 | Butler motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-03-30 | Smitherman motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Roll Call 607 | |
2010-03-30 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-03-25 | Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-25 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 602 | |
2010-03-25 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 601 | |
2010-03-25 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 600 | |
2010-03-25 | Health Amendment Offered | |
2010-03-25 | Health Amendment Offered | |
2010-03-25 | Health Amendment Offered | |
2010-03-25 | Unfinished Business | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments | |
2010-01-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |