AL SB261 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, sale of tax liens, tax liens authorized to be sold at auction to the bidder with the lowest interest rate, Secs. 40-10-199, 40-10-200 added; Secs. 40-10-180 to 40-10-198, inclusive, am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, sale of tax liens, tax liens authorized to be sold at auction to the bidder with the lowest interest rate, Secs. 40-10-199, 40-10-200 added; Secs. 40-10-180 to 40-10-198, inclusive, am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFurther Consideration
2018-03-28SenateDial motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-28SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2018-03-06SenateDial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-06SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 616
2018-03-06SenateDial first Substitute Offered
2018-03-06SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-02-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-30SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback