AL SB251 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Wingo motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Wingo motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education, Math and Science Teacher Education Program, to increase the loan repayment award for qualified math and science teachers per semester, Secs. 16-5-54, 16-5-55 am'd.
Title
Education, Math and Science Teacher Education Program, to increase the loan repayment award for qualified math and science teachers per semester, Secs. 16-5-54, 16-5-55 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Butler [R] | Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 822 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 821 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 821 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Wingo motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2022-04-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-31 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 822 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
Same As/Similar To
HB435 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |