AL SB250 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on April 6, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on April 6, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lowndes Co., sheriff, expense allowance, salary upon next term of office
Title
Lowndes Co., sheriff, expense allowance, salary upon next term of office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on April 6, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-143. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-04-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 402 |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 362 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |