AL SB25 | 2012 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Delivered to Governor at 4:55 a.m. Governors Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Senate, redistricting pursuant to 2010 federal census, venue for legal action challenging to be in Montgomery County Circuit Court, official maps of districts retained in Secretary of State Office and printed with Acts, use for legislative intent, Sec. 29-1-2.3 repealed; Sec. 29-1-2.3 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate, redistricting pursuant to 2010 federal census, venue for legal action challenging to be in Montgomery County Circuit Court, official maps of districts retained in Secretary of State Office and printed with Acts, use for legislative intent, Sec. 29-1-2.3 repealed; Sec. 29-1-2.3 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-11-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - Henry motion to Previous Question (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - McClendon motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - McClendon motion to Table (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Sanders motion to Adopt (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-24 Delivered to Governor at 4:55 a.m. Governors Office
2012-05-24 Assigned Act No. 2012-603.
2012-05-24 Signature Requested
2012-05-24 Enrolled
2012-05-24 Passed Second House
2012-05-24 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 26
2012-05-24 Henry motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 25
2012-05-24 McClendon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 24
2012-05-24 Hubbard (J) first Substitute Offered
2012-05-24 McClendon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 23
2012-05-24 McCampbell first Substitute Offered
2012-05-24 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-23 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-22 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
2012-05-22 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 18
2012-05-22 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-21 Unfinished Business.
2012-05-21 Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 13
2012-05-21 Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 12.
2012-05-21 Keahey first Substitute Offered
2012-05-21 Smitherman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 11
2012-05-21 Smitherman first Substitute Offered
2012-05-21 Sanders motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 10
2012-05-21 Sanders first Substitute Offered
2012-05-21 Singleton motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 9
2012-05-21 Singleton first Substitute Offered
2012-05-21 Unfinished Business
2012-05-18 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-17 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB25
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB25-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452207&VOTE=9&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452246&VOTE=10&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452251&VOTE=11&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452277&VOTE=12&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452278&VOTE=13&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452418&VOTE=18&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452711&VOTE=23&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452724&VOTE=24&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452743&VOTE=25&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452793&VOTE=26&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback