AL SB246 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Etowah Co., prohibit commencement of operations at certain animal byproduct processing facilities near municipal limits after January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Etowah Co., prohibit commencement of operations at certain animal byproduct processing facilities near municipal limits after January 1, 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 907 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - SBIR: Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 662 (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateIndefinitely Postponed
2021-04-13SenateJones motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2021-04-13SenateMotion to pending
2021-04-13SenateJones motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote
2021-04-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 907
2021-04-13SenateThird Reading Received
2021-04-13SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2021-03-18SenateJones motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2021-03-18SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2021-03-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback