AL SB246 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EMS personel, revise licensing process to authorize criminal background checks, revise licensing fees, etc., Secs. 22-18-4, 22-18-6 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMS personel, revise licensing process to authorize criminal background checks, revise licensing fees, etc., Secs. 22-18-4, 22-18-6 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22HousePending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Health
2018-02-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2018-02-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 385
2018-02-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-30SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback