AL SB24 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Assigned Act No. 2015-534.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, sales and lodging, certificate of exemption required, report to Revenue Department required

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, sales and lodging, certificate of exemption required, report to Revenue Department required

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2015-08-11 - House - Knight motion to Carry Over 12 hours (Y: 29 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2015-08-11 - House - Boyd motion to Carry Over Until Specified Time (Y: 20 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2015-08-11 - House - Greer motion to Table (Y: 61 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-11SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-534.
2015-08-11HouseSignature Requested
2015-08-11SenateEnrolled
2015-08-11SenatePassed Second House
2015-08-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 52
2015-08-11HouseKnight motion to Carry Over 12 hours lost Roll Call 51
2015-08-11HouseBoyd motion to Carry Over Until Specified Time lost Roll Call 50
2015-08-11HouseBoyd motion to Miscellaneous adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-11HouseGreer motion to withdraw his motion to table offered
2015-08-11HouseGreer motion to Table offered
2015-08-11HouseBoyd motion to Carry Over Temporarily pending
2015-08-11HouseGreer motion to Table adopted Roll Call 49
2015-08-11HouseKnight Amendment Offered
2015-08-11HouseGreer motion to withdraw his motion adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-11HouseGreer motion to Carry Over Temporarily pending
2015-08-11HouseGreer motion to Table adopted Roll Call
2015-08-11HouseGreer motion to Table adopted Roll Call
2015-08-11HouseGreer motion to withdraw his motion adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-11HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-05SenateEngrossed
2015-08-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2015-08-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 35
2015-08-05SenatePittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 34
2015-08-05SenatePittman Amendment Offered
2015-08-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-05SenatePittman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-05SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-08-04SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB24
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015FS/PrintFiles/SB24-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=528481&VOTE=34&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=528482&VOTE=35&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=529802&VOTE=49&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=529814&VOTE=50&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=529818&VOTE=51&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=529819&VOTE=52&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback