AL SB238 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2017-270.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2017-270.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Circuit clerks, Judicial Administration Fund, use for merit and promotion raises, Sec. 12-19-310 am'd.
Title
Circuit clerks, Judicial Administration Fund, use for merit and promotion raises, Sec. 12-19-310 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-270. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 811 |
2017-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 394 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |