AL SB233 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2022-375.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2022-375.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Courts, criminal cases, virtual hearings, objections by defendant, Secs. 15-26-1, 15-26-2 am'd.
Title
Courts, criminal cases, virtual hearings, objections by defendant, Secs. 15-26-1, 15-26-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Will Barfoot [R] | Sen. Sam Givhan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 943 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 552 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 551 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 550 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 552 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 551 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 550 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-375. |
2022-04-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-05 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 943 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Voice Vote 908 |
2022-04-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote 907 |
2022-04-05 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2022-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-03-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 552 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Barfoot motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 551 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 26 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 26 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |