AL SB230 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to amusement rides and water slides; to impose new safety requirements pertaining to the operation and maintenance of amusement rides and water slides.
Title
Relating to amusement rides and water slides; to impose new safety requirements pertaining to the operation and maintenance of amusement rides and water slides.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | Senate | Indefinitely Postpone |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Tourism |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Tourism LOS0AA-1 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Tourism 3XY1VE-1 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Tourism JRWZYF-1 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Tourism |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |